MA H2107 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4611
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide concurrent police authority for Massachusetts Port Authority properties. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To provide concurrent police authority for Massachusetts Port Authority properties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4611 |
2016-01-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/04/2016 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H4611 (Replaced by) 2016-09-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2107 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2107.pdf |