MA S1154 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2199

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the use of interactive audio, video or other electronic media for the purpose of medical diagnosis, consultation or treatment. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to full application of telemedicine coverage

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-28SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2199
2015-09-29JointHearing rescheduled to 09/29/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-09-22JointHearing scheduled for 09/29/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2199 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S1231
S529 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S617 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2382
S1130 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied H1997
S82 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2382
S1027 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S438 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S404 (Similar To) 2016-02-22 - Accompanied S452
S487 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
H975 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H979 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback