MA S1204 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2199
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure safe medication administration. Public Health.
Title
To ensure safe medication administration
Sponsors
Sen. Marc Pacheco [D] | Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Rep. Denise Garlick [D] |
Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Rep. Dennis Rosa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2199 |
2015-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S2199 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S1231
S1156 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied H1998
S1090 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S850 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1491 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S2386 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S794 (Similar To) 2016-07-11 - New draft substituted, see S2420
S1156 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied H1998
S1090 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S850 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1491 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S2386 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S794 (Similar To) 2016-07-11 - New draft substituted, see S2420
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1204 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1204.pdf |