MA S1202 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2199

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to patient notification. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to patient notification

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-28SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2199
2015-10-13JointHearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2199 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S1231
S1087 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S262 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2288
S432 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied H728
S96 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2306
S2334 (Similar To) 2016-06-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback