MA S1087 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2385

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to enforce snow removal requirements. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To enforce snow removal requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-05SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2385
2015-12-03JointHearing scheduled for 12/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

S2385 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1061 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2263
S1754 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
S1120 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2212
S2263 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1654 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S478 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S367 (Similar To) 2016-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4484
S380 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S1011 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback