IL SB3650 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 2:00 pm in Room 114
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 2:00 pm in Room 114
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: Makes changes in provisions concerning equal pay for equal work and the duties of third party clients. Defines "applicant". Makes conforming changes. Effective April 1, 2024.
Title
DAY & TEMPORARY LABOR AGENCIES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2024-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 041-014-000 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Labor; 011-004-000 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 175 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 175 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 175 | 42 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 175 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 175 | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |