MA S2334 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S1151

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2016 - 50% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the modernization of optometric patient care,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2334)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the modernization of optometric patient care

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-27HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2016-06-27HouseRules suspended
2016-06-13SenateRead, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
2016-06-13SenateNew draft of S1151
2016-06-13SenateReported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

S1151 (Replaces) 2016-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2334
S2126 (Similar To) 2016-02-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S127 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S833 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H1981 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
S1070 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2065

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback