MA S432 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H728

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied H728
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the use of shotguns for hunting. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the use of shotguns for hunting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-07HouseAccompanied H728
2015-11-02JointHearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Division of Fisheries and Wildlife
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H728 (Replaced by) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S412 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
H711 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S427 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Accompanied S414
S430 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S429 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Accompanied S415
S446 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2069

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback