MA H258 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4908
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4908
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4908
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a special commission supported by the Department of Health and Human Services to better prepare the Commonwealth for climate change refugees. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Resolve to better prepare the Commonwealth for climate change refugees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4908 |
2022-01-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/18/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H1271 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S1908 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
S428 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S2113 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
S16 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
H2587 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S82 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H4313 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2022
H4908 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2727 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2638 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1908 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
S428 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S2113 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
S16 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
H2587 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S82 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H4313 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2022
H4908 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2727 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2638 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H258 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H258.pdf |