IL SB2442 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Fair Patient Billing Act. Provides that a hospital may not bill an uninsured patient that requires health care services if it determines, through its financial assistance screening process, that the patient has a household income that qualifies the person for free care under the Hospital Uninsured Patient Discount Act. Provides that if the patient is deemed eligible for public health insurance or any other insurance product certified by the Department of Insurance, the hospital shall provide information to the patient about how the patient can apply for the insurance program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FAIR PATIENT BILLING-INCOME

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-21SenateSent to the Governor
2024-05-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
2024-05-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
2024-05-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
2024-05-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2024-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2024-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2024-05-23SenatePassed Both Houses
2024-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2024-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2024-05-21HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2024-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2024-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2024-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2024-05-20HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 014-000-000
2024-05-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
2024-05-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2024-05-13HouseCommittee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
2024-05-13HouseAssigned to Insurance Committee
2024-05-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2024-05-13HouseFirst Reading
2024-05-09HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2024-05-09HouseArrived in House
2024-05-09SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2024-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2024-05-08SenateSecond Reading
2024-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2024
2024-05-08SenateDo Pass as Amended Insurance; 010-000-000
2024-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2024-05-03SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
2024-04-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2024-04-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2024-04-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons
2024-04-19SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
2024-04-12SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
2024-04-05SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2024
2024-03-15SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
2024-03-06SenatePostponed - Insurance
2024-01-24SenateAssigned to Insurance
2023-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2023-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2108835Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback