MA H4016 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Section 128 contained in the engrossed Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2022 for the maintenance of the departments, boards, commissions, institutions and certain activities of the Commonwealth, for interest, sinking fund and serial bond requirements and for certain permanent improvements (see House, No. 4002), which had been returned by His Excellency the Governor with recommendation of amendment (for message see Attachment P of House, No. 4019). July 22, 2021.
Title
Establishing a special legislative commission to study poverty in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-09-30 - Senate - Senate Question on passing , notwithstanding the objections of the Governor Roll Call #86 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-23 - House - House Passed over veto - 131 YEAS to 28 NAYS (Y: 131 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-23 - House - House Passed over veto - 131 YEAS to 28 NAYS (Y: 131 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Senate | Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021 |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Passed over veto - see Roll Call #86 (Yeas 36 to Nays 2) |
2021-09-23 | House | Passed over veto - 131 YEAS to 28 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 100 ) |
2021-08-05 | House | Placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-08-05 | House | For message, see H4055 |
2021-08-03 | Governor returned to the House with veto | |
2021-08-02 | Senate | Again enacted and again laid before the Governor |
2021-08-02 | House | Re-enacted |
2021-08-02 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2021-08-02 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2021-07-29 | Senate | Governor's amendment rejected |
2021-07-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-07-28 | House | Governor's amendment rejected |
2021-07-28 | House | Governor's amendment considered (in the form approved by the committee on Bills in the Third Reading) |
2021-07-28 | House | Bills in the Third Reading Special report accepted |
2021-07-22 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading |
2021-07-22 | House | For message, see H4019, Attachment P |
2021-07-22 | House | Governor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment |
2021-07-22 | House | Enacted as section 128 of the General Appropriation Bill, see H4002 |
Same As/Similar To
H4002 (Replaced by) 2021-07-29 - Section 121 passed over veto -see Roll Call #70 (Yeas 39 to Nays 1)
H4019 (Replaced by) 2021-07-22 - See H4002
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
H4055 (Replaced by) 2021-08-05 - See H4016
H4019 (Replaced by) 2021-07-22 - See H4002
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
H4055 (Replaced by) 2021-08-05 - See H4016