MA H4019 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4012
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on July 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-22 - See H4002
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-22 - See H4002
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the message from His Excellency the Governor returning the General Appropriation Bill for fiscal year 2022 (see House, No. 4002) as relates to Attachments A through R, for items returned with disapproval of wording under the provisions of Section 5 of Article LXIII and sections returned with recommendations of amendments under the provisions of Article LVI of the Amendments to the Constitution (House, No. 4019). July 19, 2021.
Title
So much of the message from His Excellency the Governor returning the General Appropriation Bill for fiscal year 2022 (see House, No. 4002) as relates to Attachments A through R, for items returned with disapproval of wording under the provisions of Section 5 of Article LXIII and sections returned with recommendations of amendments under the provisions of Article LVI of the Amendments to the Constitution (House, No. 4019). July 19, 2021.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-22 | House | See H4002 |
Same As/Similar To
H4012 (Replaced by) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2021
H4002 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Section 121 passed over veto -see Roll Call #70 (Yeas 39 to Nays 1)
H4000 (Similar To) 2021-04-28 - Amendment 793 adopted, as changed
H3905 (Similar To) 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 23 of the Acts of 2021
H4001 (Similar To) 2021-07-09 - Reported, in part, by H4002
H1 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4078 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4127 (Similar To) 2021-09-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2021
H4430 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Text of a further amendment, see H4345
H4578 (Similar To) 2022-05-26 - Section 73 passed over veto - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 193 )
H5050 (Similar To) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 126 of the Acts of 2022
H4002 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Section 121 passed over veto -see Roll Call #70 (Yeas 39 to Nays 1)
H4000 (Similar To) 2021-04-28 - Amendment 793 adopted, as changed
H3905 (Similar To) 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 23 of the Acts of 2021
H4001 (Similar To) 2021-07-09 - Reported, in part, by H4002
H1 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4078 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4127 (Similar To) 2021-09-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2021
H4430 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Text of a further amendment, see H4345
H4578 (Similar To) 2022-05-26 - Section 73 passed over veto - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 193 )
H5050 (Similar To) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 126 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4019 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4019.pdf |