MA H4127 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Extending COVID-19 Massachusetts emergency paid sick leave

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending COVID-19 Massachusetts emergency paid sick leave

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-29 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2021
2021-09-27SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2021-09-27HouseEnacted
2021-09-27SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2021-09-27HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2021-09-27SenateRead, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
2021-09-27HouseRead second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed
2021-09-27HouseRules suspended
2021-09-27HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2021-09-27HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2021-09-27HouseReported on a part of H4078
2021-09-27HouseReported from the committee on House Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H4078 (Similar To) 2021-10-13 - Reported, in part, by H4200
H4002 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Section 121 passed over veto -see Roll Call #70 (Yeas 39 to Nays 1)
H4000 (Similar To) 2021-04-28 - Amendment 793 adopted, as changed
H3905 (Similar To) 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 23 of the Acts of 2021
H4019 (Similar To) 2021-07-22 - See H4002
H1 (Similar To) 2021-04-15 - Reported, in part, by H4000
H4001 (Similar To) 2021-07-09 - Reported, in part, by H4002
H4200 (Similar To) 2021-10-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2021
H4430 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Text of a further amendment, see H4345
H4532 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Published as amended, see H4578
H4578 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4677 for section 38

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback