MA H4001 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Reported, in part, by H4002
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2022 for the maintenance of the departments, boards, commissions, institutions and certain activities of the Commonwealth, for interest, sinking fund and serial bond requirements and for certain permanent improvements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2022 for the maintenance of the departments, boards, commissions, institutions and certain activities of the Commonwealth, for interest, sinking fund and serial bond requirements and for certain permanent improvements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #46 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-09HouseReported, in part, by H4002
2021-06-07SenateCommittee of conference appointed - (Rodrigues-Friedman-O'Connor)
2021-06-07SenateSenate insisted on its amendments
2021-06-07SenateRules suspended
2021-06-07HouseCommittee of conference appointed - (Michlewitz-Ferrante-Smola)
2021-06-07HouseHouse NON-concurred in the Senate amendment
2021-06-07HouseRules suspended
2021-05-27SenatePassed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #46 (40 Yeas - 0 Nays)
2021-05-27SenateRead third
2021-05-27SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-05-27SenateReprinted as amended, see S2465
2021-05-27SenateAmended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S3, amended
2021-05-27SenateFor Senate actions, see S3
2021-05-25SenateRead second
2021-05-11SenatePlaced in the Orders of the Day for Tuesday, May 25, 2021, pursuant to an order previously adopted
2021-05-11SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S3
2021-05-06SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2021-05-03HousePassed to be engrossed - 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 32 )
2021-05-03HouseH4000, published as amended

Same As/Similar To

H4000 (Replaces) 2021-05-03 - Published as amended, see H4001
S3 (Replaced by) 2021-05-27 - See H4001
H1 (Similar To) 2021-04-15 - Reported, in part, by H4000
S2465 (Replaces) 2021-05-27 - See H4001
H4002 (Replaced by) 2021-07-29 - Section 121 passed over veto -see Roll Call #70 (Yeas 39 to Nays 1)
H3973 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2021
H4127 (Similar To) 2021-09-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2021

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback