MA H4000 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4001

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Published as amended, see H4001
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2022 for the maintenance of the departments, boards, commissions, institutions and certain activities of the Commonwealth, for interest, sinking fund and serial bond requirements and for certain permanent improvements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2022 for the maintenance of the departments, boards, commissions, institutions and certain activities of the Commonwealth, for interest, sinking fund and serial bond requirements and for certain permanent improvements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - House - House 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House 158 YEAS to 1 NAYS (Y: 158 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03HousePublished as amended, see H4001
2021-05-03HousePassed to be engrossed
2021-05-03HouseAmendment 1158 adopted, as amended
2021-05-03HouseFurther amendment adopted
2021-05-03HouseMotion to reconsider amendment 1158 prevailed
2021-05-03HouseMotion to reconsider prevailed
2021-04-29HousePassed to be engrossed - 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 32 )
2021-04-29HouseAmendment 1158 adopted
2021-04-28HouseAmendment 1008 adopted, as changed
2021-04-28HouseAmendment 793 adopted, as changed
2021-04-28HouseAmendment 594 adopted, as changed
2021-04-28HouseConsolidated amendment G (Labor and Economic Development) adopted - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 31 )
2021-04-28HouseConsolidated amendment F (Energy and Environmental Affairs and Housing) adopted - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 30 )
2021-04-28HouseConsolidated amendment E (Constitutional Officers and State Administration and Transportation) adopted - 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 29 )
2021-04-28HouseQuorum Roll Call - 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 28 )
2021-04-27HouseConsolidated amendment D (Mental Health and Disability Services and Public Health) adopted - 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 27 )
2021-04-27HouseConsolidated amendment C (Public Safety and Judiciary) adopted - 158 YEAS to 1 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 26 )
2021-04-27HouseAmendment 733 rejected
2021-04-27HouseConsolidated amendment B (Health and Human Services and and Elder Affairs) adopted - 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 25 )
2021-04-27HouseQuorum Roll Call - 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 24 )
2021-04-26HouseConsolidated amendment A (Education and Local Aid, Social Services and Veterans Services and Soldiers' Homes) adopted - 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 23 )
2021-04-26HouseRead third
2021-04-26HouseRules suspended
2021-04-26HouseOrdered to a third reading
2021-04-26HouseAmendment 930 adopted, as changed
2021-04-26HouseAmendment 800 adopted, as changed - 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 22 )
2021-04-26HouseAmendment 413 adopted, as changed - 160 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 21 )
2021-04-15HouseFurther action postponed until Monday, April 26, 2021
2021-04-15HouseRead second
2021-04-15HouseRules suspended
2021-04-15HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2021-04-15HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2021-04-15HouseReported on a part of H1
2021-04-15HouseReported from the committee on House Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H4001 (Replaced by) 2021-07-09 - Reported, in part, by H4002
H1 (Similar To) 2021-04-15 - Reported, in part, by H4000
S355 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3123 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
H631 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4002 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Section 121 passed over veto -see Roll Call #70 (Yeas 39 to Nays 1)
H3973 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2021
H4127 (Similar To) 2021-09-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2021
S1866 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4000
Texthttps://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/HouseRollCall23.pdf
Roll Callhttps://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/HouseRollCall26.pdf
Roll Callhttps://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/HouseRollCall30.pdf
Roll Callhttps://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/HouseRollCall31.pdf
Roll Callhttps://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/HouseRollCall29.pdf
Roll Callhttps://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/HouseRollCall32.pdf
Roll Callhttps://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/HouseRollCall28.pdf
Roll Callhttps://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/HouseRollCall27.pdf
Roll Callhttps://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/HouseRollCall24.pdf
Roll Callhttps://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/HouseRollCall25.pdf
Roll Callhttps://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/HouseRollCall21.pdf
Roll Callhttps://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/HouseRollCall22.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback