MA H3123 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4718

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4718
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Ms. Doherty of Taunton, a petition of Carol A. Doherty and others that the State Treasurer annually mail to resident taxpayers of the Commonwealth information on the federal and state budgets. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing federal and state budget information to residents of the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-21HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4718
2022-03-03SenateSenate concurred
2022-02-09HouseReporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence
2021-09-03JointHearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

H2309 (Similar To) 2021-10-15 - Hearing scheduled for 10/28/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4718 (Replaced by) 2022-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback