MA H3973 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4001

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

The committee of conference on the disagreeing votes of the two branches with reference to the Senate amendment of the House Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2021 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects (House, No. 3871), reports recommending passage of the accompanying bill (House, No. 3973).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making appropriations for fiscal year 2021 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-21 - Senate - Senate conference committee report Roll Call #56 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-29SenateSigned by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2021
2021-07-21SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2021-07-21HouseEnacted
2021-07-21SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2021-07-21HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2021-07-21SenateCommittee of conference report accepted -see Roll Call #56 (Yeas 40 to Nays 0)
2021-07-21SenateRules suspended
2021-07-19HouseCommittee of conference report accepted
2021-07-19HouseRules suspended
2021-07-19HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
2021-07-19HouseReferred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2021-07-19HouseReported on H3871
2021-07-19HouseReported from the committee of conference

Same As/Similar To

H4001 (Replaced by) 2021-07-09 - Reported, in part, by H4002
S2487 (Similar To) 2021-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 45 of the Acts of 2021
H3862 (Similar To) 2021-06-10 - Published as amended, see H3871
H3871 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied H3973
H3773 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Accompanied H3862
H3827 (Similar To) 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 22 of the Acts of 2021
H4211 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2021
H4361 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Senate concurred
H4362 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Senate concurred
H4633 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Read for its information

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback