MA H631 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to permanently establish the Foundation Budget Review Commission. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to foundation budget review commission permanence

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24JointHearing scheduled for 07/06/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S355 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S591 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2805

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback