MA S355 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2755
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the Commonwealth's share of the education foundation budget. Education.
Title
Increasing the Commonwealth's share of the education foundation budget
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2755 |
2021-06-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S5 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Amendment again agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #48 and House Roll Call #38 (Yeas 159 to Nays 41)
S320 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S323 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2495 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - New draft substituted, see S2534
S2502 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2558
H4018 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2021
H4056 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4018
S2525 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, see S2557
S2541 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S789 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S790 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
S1105 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S849 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S823 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H561 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5136
H515 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
S2412 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S850 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S275 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2710
S1382 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S324 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2755 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S796 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
H620 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5099
S320 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S323 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2495 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - New draft substituted, see S2534
S2502 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2558
H4018 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2021
H4056 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4018
S2525 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, see S2557
S2541 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S789 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S790 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
S1105 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S849 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S823 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H561 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5136
H515 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
S2412 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S850 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S275 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2710
S1382 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S324 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2755 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S796 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
H620 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5099
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S355 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S355.pdf |