MA H1 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Reported, in part, by H4000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Making appropriations for the Fiscal Year 2022 for the maintenance of the departments, boards, commissions, institutions, and certain activities of the Commonwealth, for interest, sinking fund, and serial bond requirements, and for certain permanent improvements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making appropriations for the Fiscal Year 2022 for the maintenance of the departments, boards, commissions, institutions, and certain activities of the Commonwealth, for interest, sinking fund, and serial bond requirements, and for certain permanent improvements

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15HouseReported, in part, by H4000
2021-02-25HouseReferred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H4000 (Similar To) 2021-05-03 - Published as amended, see H4001
H4001 (Similar To) 2021-07-09 - Reported, in part, by H4002
S355 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3123 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
H631 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4002 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Section 121 passed over veto -see Roll Call #70 (Yeas 39 to Nays 1)
H3973 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2021
H4127 (Similar To) 2021-09-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2021
S1866 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Hearing rescheduled to 01/25/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback