CA AB832 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Roth.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Roth.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14502 of the Government Code, relating to the California Transportation Commission.
Title
California Transportation Commission: membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - AB 832 Cervantes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - AB 832 Cervantes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-13 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Roth. |
2023-07-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-06-29 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 15. Page 1686.) |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 26). |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-03-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |