IL HB2911 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
AGING-OMBUDSMAN PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2023 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 009-004-000 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Executive |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 11, 2023 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2023-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2023-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 |
2023-04-11 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 105 | 4.04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |