CA SB1509 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Set for hearing April 29.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Set for hearing April 29.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12810 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Negligent Operator Treatment (NOT) in California Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D] | Sen. Roger Niello [R] |
Sen. Kelly Seyarto [R] | Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1. Page 3536.) (April 9). |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 9). |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 12810 | Amended Code | Citation Text |