MA H4200 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2021 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Title
Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2021 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-20 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2021 | |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-10-14 | House | Enacted |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2021-10-14 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2021-10-14 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2021-10-14 | House | Referred to House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Rodrigues) adopted |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second |
2021-10-13 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-10-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-10-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-10-13 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-10-13 | House | Reported on a part of H4078 |
2021-10-13 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4127 (Similar To) 2021-09-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2021
H4078 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4002 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Section 121 passed over veto -see Roll Call #70 (Yeas 39 to Nays 1)
H1 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4000 (Similar To) 2021-04-28 - Amendment 793 adopted, as changed
H4019 (Similar To) 2021-07-22 - See H4002
H4430 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Text of a further amendment, see H4345
H4532 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Published as amended, see H4578
H4578 (Similar To) 2022-05-26 - Section 73 passed over veto - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 193 )
H4932 (Similar To) 2022-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 103 of the Acts of 2022
H3905 (Similar To) 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 23 of the Acts of 2021
H4078 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4002 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Section 121 passed over veto -see Roll Call #70 (Yeas 39 to Nays 1)
H1 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4000 (Similar To) 2021-04-28 - Amendment 793 adopted, as changed
H4019 (Similar To) 2021-07-22 - See H4002
H4430 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Text of a further amendment, see H4345
H4532 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Published as amended, see H4578
H4578 (Similar To) 2022-05-26 - Section 73 passed over veto - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 193 )
H4932 (Similar To) 2022-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 103 of the Acts of 2022
H3905 (Similar To) 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 23 of the Acts of 2021
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4200 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4200.pdf |