CA SB1014 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-08-15 - August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-08-15 - August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 7.4 (commencing with Section 15480) to Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to wildfire safety.
Title
Wildfire safety: The California Wildfire Mitigation Strategic Planning Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB1014 Dodd (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB1014 Dodd (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-15 | Assembly | August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2024-07-02 | Assembly | July 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | June 26 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.M. and NAT. RES. |
2024-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4209.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3968.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3607.) (April 15). |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 3283.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Set for hearing March 12. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and N.R. & W. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15480 | New Code | See Bill Text |