NY S04020 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to emergency medical services; establishes a special district for the financing and operation of general ambulance services; provides for a statewide comprehensive emergency medical system plan.
Title
Relates to emergency medical services; establishes a special district for the financing and operation of general ambulance services; provides for a statewide comprehensive emergency medical system plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-03-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4020C |
2024-03-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-01-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4020B |
2024-01-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2023-06-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4020A |
2023-06-01 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2023-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A03392 (Same As) 2024-03-20 - print number 3392c