MA S2497 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2561

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on July 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to amend the town charter of the town of North Andover. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local approval received]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To amend the town charter of the town of North Andover

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-25SenateNew Draft substituted, see S2561
2021-10-25SenateRead third
2021-10-25SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2021-10-21SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2021-09-23SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2021-09-03JointHearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-07-22HouseHouse concurred
2021-07-21SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H3925 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3899 (Similar To) 2021-11-16 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4259
H3920 (Similar To) 2021-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 114 of the Acts of 2021
S2498 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2022
H3705 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2021
S1330 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H2190
H3792 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4066 (Similar To) 2021-11-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 90 of the Acts of 2021
H3794 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2190 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 20 of the Acts of 2022
S1354 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2778
S2561 (Replaced by) 2021-12-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 105 of the Acts of 2021
H4580 (Similar To) 2022-04-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2022

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback