MA H4017 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4002
Note: Legislation replaced by H4019

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Section 129 contained in the engrossed Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2022 for the maintenance of the departments, boards, commissions, institutions and certain activities of the Commonwealth, for interest, sinking fund and serial bond requirements and for certain permanent improvements (see House, No. 4002), which had been returned by His Excellency the Governor with recommendation of amendment (for message see Attachment Q of House, No. 4019). July 22, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a special commission to examine the Department of Public Health’s nursing home licensure process and requirements

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-03 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
2021-08-02SenateAgain enacted and again laid before the Governor
2021-08-02HouseRe-enacted
2021-08-02SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2021-08-02HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2021-07-29SenateGovernor's amendment rejected
2021-07-29SenateRules suspended
2021-07-28HouseGovernor's amendment rejected
2021-07-28HouseGovernor's amendment considered (in the form approved by the committee on Bills in the Third Reading)
2021-07-28HouseBills in the Third Reading Special report accepted
2021-07-22HouseReferred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading
2021-07-22HouseFor message, see H4019, Attachment Q
2021-07-22HouseGovernor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment
2021-07-22HouseEnacted as section 129 of the General Appropriation Bill, see H4002

Same As/Similar To

H4002 (Replaced by) 2021-07-29 - Section 121 passed over veto -see Roll Call #70 (Yeas 39 to Nays 1)
H4019 (Replaced by) 2021-07-22 - See H4002
H550 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4795
H2112 (Similar To) 2021-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S49 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback