MA S1736 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2679

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to surplus in retirement systems. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to surplus in retirement systems

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-10SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2679
2021-10-08JointHearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1347 (Similar To) 2021-12-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H353 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H160 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Hearing scheduled for 12/01/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
H1315 (Similar To) 2021-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H847 (Similar To) 2021-05-11 - Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1282 (Similar To) 2022-05-26 - Senate concurred
S873 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S113 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2847
S361 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2393 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S2679 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback