MA S361 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2756
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a Special Commission to Re-Imagine School Assessment and Accountability. Education.
Title
Establishing a Special Commission to Re-Imagine School Assessment and Accountability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2756 |
2021-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H353 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H160 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5022
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
H1315 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1282 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S873 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2393 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2756 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1383 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H353 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H160 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5022
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
H1315 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1282 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S873 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2393 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2756 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1383 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S361 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S361.pdf |