MA H609 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Pending: Joint Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to child suicide. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve providing for an investigation and study by a special commission relative to child suicide

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-21HouseResolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
2021-05-19JointHearing scheduled for 05/20/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback