MA S2044 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-08 - Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Hearing: Sep 22 @ 10:30 am in Virtual Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation for an investigation by a special commission (including members of the General Court) relative to the legislative process. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a special commission to study the legislative process

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-08JointHearing scheduled for 09/22/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

S2436 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback