CA SB310 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3333.8 of the Civil Code, and to amend Sections 4002.4 and 4002.6 of, and to add and repeal Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 4505) of Chapter 7 of Part 2 of Division 4 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to fire prevention.
Title
Prescribed fire: civil liability: cultural burns.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 892.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 657.) (April 11). |
2023-03-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 3333.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4002.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4002.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4505 | New Code | See Bill Text |