MA H3725 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to providing for the appointment of two alternate members of the conservation commission of the town of Tyngsborough. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing alternates on the Tyngsborough conservation commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-21 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
2022-01-20SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2022-01-19HouseEnacted
2022-01-18SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2022-01-18SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2021-10-06SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2021-09-16SenateRead; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2021-09-13HouseRead third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2021-08-26HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2021-08-26HouseRules suspended
2021-08-26HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2021-08-02HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2021-07-16JointHearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-05-06SenateSenate concurred
2021-05-06HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H2156 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2021
H4482 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - House concurred
H4483 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H4484 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback