MA H4483 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 318 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 318 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Tyngsborough be authorized to change the name of the board of selectmen of said town to a select board. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Changing the Board of Selectmen of the town of Tyngsborough to a Select Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-28 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 318 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-12-22 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-12-22 | House | Enacted |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-08-15 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-06-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-06-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-04-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-03-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/14/2022 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1361 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2451
S2451 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2875
S2464 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2021
S2550 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
S2440 (Similar To) 2022-11-21 - Joint session held and dissolved
H4682 (Similar To) 2023-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 395 of the Acts of 2022
S2875 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 217 of the Acts of 2022
S2936 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - New draft substituted (Tarr), see S3166
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
H4482 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5284
H4484 (Similar To) 2022-10-20 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5359
H5359 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 342 of the Acts of 2022
S2451 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2875
S2464 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2021
S2550 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
S2440 (Similar To) 2022-11-21 - Joint session held and dissolved
H4682 (Similar To) 2023-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 395 of the Acts of 2022
S2875 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 217 of the Acts of 2022
S2936 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - New draft substituted (Tarr), see S3166
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
H4482 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5284
H4484 (Similar To) 2022-10-20 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5359
H5359 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 342 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4483 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4483.pdf |