MA S2451 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S1361
Note: Legislation replaced by S2875

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2875
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to amend the Newbury general by-laws from board of selectmen to select board, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2451).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the Newbury general by-laws from board of selectmen to select board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-12SenateNew draft substituted, see S2875
2022-05-12SenateRead third
2022-05-12SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2021-06-24SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2021-05-24SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2021-05-24SenateNew draft of S1361
2021-05-24SenateReported from the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

S1361 (Replaces) 2021-05-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2451
S2474 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - New draft (O'Connor) substituted, see S2706
S2440 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Joint session held and recessed to Monday, November 21, 2022
S2464 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2021
S2482 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2799
H3917 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4302
S2491 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - New draft substituted, see S2588
H3987 (Similar To) 2022-02-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2022
S2513 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2166 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2021
H298 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S1354 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2778
S2550 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
S2875 (Replaced by) 2022-05-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback