MA S1361 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2451

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2451
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to amend the Newbury general by-laws from board of selectmen to select board. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local approval received]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the Newbury general by-laws from board of selectmen to select board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-24SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2451
2021-05-14JointHearing scheduled for 05/17/2021 from 12:00 PM-12:01 PM in Written Testimony Only
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

S2451 (Replaced by) 2022-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2875
S2474 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - New draft (O'Connor) substituted, see S2706
S2440 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Joint session held and recessed to Monday, November 21, 2022
S2464 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2021
H3860 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4222
S2482 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2799
H3917 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4302
S2491 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - New draft substituted, see S2588
H3987 (Similar To) 2022-02-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2022
S2513 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2166 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2021
H298 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S1354 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2778
S2550 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback