MA S994 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prohibit discrimination based on natural hairstyles. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting discrimination based on natural hairstyles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-01HouseAccompanied H1907
2021-11-16JointHearing scheduled for 11/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H1907 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft substituted, see H4554
S1049 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S2473 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - House concurred
H3708 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Report accepted, in concurrence
S2484 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Hearing rescheduled to 01/25/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4085 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Senate concurred
S2538 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2758
S2233 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1619 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2017 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1613 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S334 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S221 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S2146 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S170 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1164 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback