MA S2484 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5250
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to third party settlement organizations. Revenue.
Title
Relative to third party settlement organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5250 |
2022-01-24 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/25/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/25/2022 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-24 | House | House concurred |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2473 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3708 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Report accepted, in concurrence
S1810 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S2140 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4063 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4085 (Similar To) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4943
S2538 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2758
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2233 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1619 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2316 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2964
S216 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S788 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
S1931 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2956
S1613 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S221 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S2146 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S170 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1375 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Accompanied H2319
S1164 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
H5250 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1920 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H3708 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Report accepted, in concurrence
S1810 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S2140 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4063 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4085 (Similar To) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4943
S2538 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2758
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2233 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1619 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2316 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2964
S216 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S788 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
S1931 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2956
S1613 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S221 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S2146 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S170 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1375 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Accompanied H2319
S1164 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
H5250 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1920 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2484 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2484.pdf |