MA S82 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Pending: Joint Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a special commission to study women and homelessness. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a special commission to study women and homelessness

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-26SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
2021-10-07JointHearing scheduled for 10/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

H229 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1271 (Similar To) 2021-10-01 - Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S428 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S2113 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
S16 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
S2076 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S2276 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - New draft substituted, see S2612
S1227 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2724
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H4555 (Similar To) 2022-05-23 - Enacted and laid before the Governor

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback