MA H1271 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5201
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to Health Policy Commission reviews of scope of practice proposals. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to Health Policy Commission reviews of scope of practice proposals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-13 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5201 |
2021-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
S786 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
S747 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
H5201 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S786 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
S747 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
H5201 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1271 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1271.pdf |