CA AB598 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 671, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 671, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 64650 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
San Francisco Bay Area Regional Housing Finance Act: regional and county expenditure plans.
Sponsors
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-31 - Assembly - AB 598 Wicks Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB598 Wicks By Dodd (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 598 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB598 Wicks By Dodd (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 598 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 671, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled measure version corrected. |
2024-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 2.). |
2024-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2024-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2024-08-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2024-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2024-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-05 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2024-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on HOUSING and L. GOV. |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-06-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-07-05 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 16. Page 2025.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18). |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 12). |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 64650 | Amended Code | Citation Text |