MA S3088 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to sustainability and resiliency in the Dorchester section of the city of Boston (Senate, No. 3078).
Title
Relative to sustainability and resiliency in the Dorchester section of the city of Boston
Sponsors
Sen. Nick Collins [D] | House Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight | Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] | Rep. David Biele [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-01 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #256 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-08-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #256 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2022-08-01 | House | Enacted - 153 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 282 ) |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-08-01 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-07-31 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-31 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-31 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2022-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment (H5160) pending |
2022-07-31 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-30 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-07-30 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-30 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-30 | Senate | Substituted for S3078 |
2022-07-30 | Senate | Recommended new draft (Collins) for S3078 |
Same As/Similar To
S3078 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - New draft (Collins) substituted, see S3088
S3060 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3078
H5148 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3065
H5146 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3053
H5144 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3004
S82 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S3090 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Bills in the Third Reading
S3091 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Message read and placed on file
H5160 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Text of an amendment, see S3088
S2115 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2041 (Similar To) 2022-07-14 - New draft substituted, see S3004
H4181 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4310
S3060 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3078
H5148 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3065
H5146 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3053
H5144 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3004
S82 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S3090 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Bills in the Third Reading
S3091 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Message read and placed on file
H5160 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Text of an amendment, see S3088
S2115 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2041 (Similar To) 2022-07-14 - New draft substituted, see S3004
H4181 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4310
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3088 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3088.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/SenateRollCall256.pdf |