MA H5160 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S3088
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on July 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-31 - Text of an amendment, see S3088
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-31 - Text of an amendment, see S3088
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Similar Bills
Title
Similar Bills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-31 | House | Text of an amendment, see S3088 |
Same As/Similar To
S3088 (Replaced by) 2022-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2022
S3078 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - New draft (Collins) substituted, see S3088
S3060 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3078
S3078 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - New draft (Collins) substituted, see S3088
S3060 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3078
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5160 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5160.pdf |