US HB5870 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-09-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 555.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-09-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 555.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to make certain improvements to the processing of claims for benefits under the laws administered by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs and the transparency of actions of Board of Veterans' Appeals, and for other purposes.
Title
Veteran Appeals Transparency Act of 2024
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Self [R-TX] | Rep. Morgan McGarvey [D-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 555. |
2024-09-10 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 118-659. |
2024-05-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote. |
2024-05-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-11-29 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-11-29 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2023-10-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2023-10-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2023-10-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5890 (Related) 2024-09-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 554.