RI S2219 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL OFFENSES -- WEAPONS - Prohibits purchases of more than one firearm in any thirty (30) day period.
Title
Prohibits purchases of more than one firearm in any thirty (30) day period.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark McKenney [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] |
Sen. Jacob Bissaillon [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2024) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2219.pdf |