HI HCR89 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-05 - Referred to HOU.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-05 - Referred to HOU.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Director Of Finance To Adopt Administrative Rules To Define "beneficial Effects To The State" In Section 38-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, To Include The Financing Of Housing.
Title
Urging The Director Of Finance To Adopt Administrative Rules To Define "beneficial Effects To The State" In Section 38-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, To Include The Financing Of Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | Referred to HOU. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 612). |
2024-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3). |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1678-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Nishimoto, Ward. |
2024-03-28 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:15PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-27 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Ganaden, Kapela, La Chica, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd excused (9). |
2024-03-27 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1409-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-03-20 | House | The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kila, Miyake, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Onishi. |
2024-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
2024-03-07 | House | To be offered. |