CA AB2443 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1927.3 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to the western Joshua tree.
Title
Western Joshua Tree Conservation Act: industrial projects and commercial projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 1927.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |