CA SB997 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-22 - Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-22 - Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 49414.6 to the Education Code, relating to pupil health.
Title
Pupil health: opioid antagonists and fentanyl test strips.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB997 Portantino et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Health] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB997 Portantino et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Health] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-07-02 | Assembly | July 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-06-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4178.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3967.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3702.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | April 24 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3378.) (March 20). |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49414.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |