MA S3091 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S3105
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - Message read and placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - Message read and placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Nantucket to convey a certain parcel of land acquired for park purposes to the Nantucket Conservation Foundation Inc. for open space, recreational and conservation purposes
Title
Authorizing the town of Nantucket to convey a certain parcel of land acquired for park purposes to the Nantucket Conservation Foundation Inc. for open space, recreational and conservation purposes
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] | House Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight | Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-01 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #253 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Senate | Message read and placed on file |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Governor returned to Senate with veto, see S3105 |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #253 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2022-07-31 | House | Enacted - 153 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY, No. 276) |
2022-07-31 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-31 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-07-31 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-31 | Senate | New draft (Cyr) of S3083 |
Same As/Similar To
S3090 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Bills in the Third Reading
H5154 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Text of an amendment, see S3073
H5153 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Text of an amendment, see S3064
S3095 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5156 (Similar To) 2022-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 249 of the Acts of 2022
S154 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2709
S2174 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1357 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2022
S574 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied H929
S148 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S3105 (Replaced by) 2022-08-11 - See S3091
S3081 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - New draft (Cyr) substituted, see S3090
S3083 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - New draft (Cyr) substituted, see S3091
S3066 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3081
S3067 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3083
H5154 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Text of an amendment, see S3073
H5153 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Text of an amendment, see S3064
S3095 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5156 (Similar To) 2022-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 249 of the Acts of 2022
S154 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2709
S2174 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1357 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2022
S574 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied H929
S148 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S3105 (Replaced by) 2022-08-11 - See S3091
S3081 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - New draft (Cyr) substituted, see S3090
S3083 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - New draft (Cyr) substituted, see S3091
S3066 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3081
S3067 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3083
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3091 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3091.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/SenateRollCall253.pdf |